Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Jun 1948 | Born | ||
8 Feb 1977 | 28.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Kohima, India |
18 Jan 2002 | 53.6 | Appointed | Coadjutor Archbishop of Imphal, India |
7 Apr 2002 | 53.8 | Ordained Bishop | Coadjutor Archbishop of Imphal, India |
12 Jul 2006 | 58.1 | Succeeded | Archbishop of Imphal, India |
7 Oct 2023 | 75.3 | Retired | Archbishop of Imphal, India |
(WikiData: Q1237610)
Archbishop
Dominic
Lumon
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus
of Imphal
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Mongsang Pangtha, Diocese of Shillong |
Ordained Bishop | Grounds of, Saint Joseph, Cathedral, Mantripuhri, Archdiocese of Imphal |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠