Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armando Lombardi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1905Born
22 Jul 192823.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 195044.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Philippi
13 Feb 195044.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
16 Apr 195044.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Philippi
24 Sep 195449.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
4 May 196458.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil

MicroData Summary for Armando Lombardi
Archbishop Armando Lombardi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Brazil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCercepiccola, Diocese of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 21
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 82, and Page 264
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 263, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 493, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 577, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 696, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 May 2021

Quantcast