Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mitja Leskovar

Apostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Beneventum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1970 Born
29 Jun 199525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
1 May 202050.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iraq
1 May 202050.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
8 Aug 202050.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
16 Apr 202454.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of

MicroData Summary for Mitja Leskovar
(VIAF: 89667583; WikiData: Q92751335)
Archbishop Mitja Leskovar (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Congo, Democratic Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKranj
Ordained Priestsv. Nikolaja, Cathedral, Ljubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana, Slovenia
Ordained Bishopsv. Nikolaja, Cathedral, Ljubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Congo, Democratic Republic of.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 20 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Number 20,458
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 9 Jul 2024