Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Dec 1972 | Born | ||
30 Nov 2002 | 29.9 | Solemn Vows | Member of Order of St. Augustine |
28 Aug 2003 | 30.7 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Order of St. Augustine |
15 Apr 2024 | 51.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
Father
Martin
Banga Ayanyaki
O.S.A.
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Buta
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Dungu |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Buta.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 15 Apr 2024 |
✠