Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olivier Claude Philippe Marie Leborgne

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1963 Born
24 Jun 199026.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Versailles, France
29 Jun 199127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
20 Feb 201450.2AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
6 Apr 201450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
4 Sep 202056.8AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
25 Oct 202056.9InstalledBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Olivier Claude Philippe Marie Leborgne (VIAF: 29691902)
Bishop Olivier Claude Philippe Marie Leborgne (born ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained DeaconSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Amiens, Diocese of Amiens

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 20 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 4 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,140
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • loc: AJ, 3 Jan 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Sep 2020
  • i: CB, 4 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 May 2021

Quantcast