Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Francis Le Stang

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1963 Born
25 Jun 198925.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
17 Jun 199026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
20 Mar 202157.7AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
13 May 202157.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Gérard Francis Le Stang
Bishop Gérard Francis Le Stang (born ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Renan, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Louis, Church, Brest, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Church, Brest, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Amiens, Diocese of Amiens

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amiens.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 20 Mar 2021
  • c1: AJ, 20 Mar 2021
  • c2+: CB, 20 Apr 2021
  • mn/bp: AJ, 21 Apr 2021
  • c0: AJ, 28 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 May 2021

Quantcast