Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Visvaldas Kulbokas

Apostolic Nuncio to Ukraine

Titular Archbishop of Martanae Tudertinorum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1974 Born
24 May 199824.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Telšiai, Lithuania
19 Jul 199824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Telšiai, Lithuania
15 Jun 202147.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ukraine
15 Jun 202147.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Martanae Tudertinorum
14 Aug 202147.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Martanae Tudertinorum

MicroData Summary for Visvaldas Kulbokas
Father Visvaldas Kulbokas (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ukraine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKlaipeda, Lithuania
Ordained DeaconSant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestSt. Michael the Archangel, Church, Gargždai, Diocese of Telšiai, Lithuania
Ordained Bishopšv. Stanislovo ir šv. Vladislovo, Cathedral Basilica, Vilnius, Archdiocese of Vilnius, Lithuania

Please contact the Father through the Nunciature to Ukraine.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2021
  • od: CB, 15 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jul 2021

Quantcast