Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Algirdas Jurevičius

Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1972 Born
26 Dec 199624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
2 Jul 201846.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
2 Jul 201846.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Materiana
19 Aug 201846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Materiana
1 Mar 201946.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
1 Jun 202048.1AppointedBishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
24 Jun 202048.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
29 Jun 202048.2InstalledBishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Algirdas Jurevičius
Bishop Algirdas Jurevičius (born ) Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVievis, Diocese of Kaišiadorys
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Kaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 19 Aug 2018
  • c3: CB, 20 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,838
  • aadm: CB, 1 Mar 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2020
  • i: CB, 1 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jul 2021

Quantcast