Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Hoeppner

Bishop Emeritus of Crookston, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1949 Born
29 Jun 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Winona, Minnesota, USA
28 Sep 200758.3AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
30 Nov 200758.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
13 Apr 202171.8ResignedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Hoeppner
Bishop Michael Joseph Hoeppner (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Crookston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinona, Diocese of Winona, Minnesota
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Crookston, Diocese of Crookston, Minnesota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Crookston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,567
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast