Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel John Felton

Bishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1955 Born
13 Jun 198126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
7 Apr 202166.1AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
20 May 202166.2Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel John Felton
Bishop Daniel John Felton (born ) Bishop of Duluth

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortsmouth, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Rosary, Cathedral, Duluth, Diocese of Duluth, Minnesota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Duluth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2021
  • mn: CB, 7 Apr 2021
  • c2+: CB, 7 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 May 2021

Quantcast