Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal De Donatis

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Apostolic Administrator of Ostia

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1954 Born
12 Apr 198026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Narḍ, Italy
28 Nov 198329.8IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Sep 201561.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Sep 201561.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Motula
9 Nov 201561.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Motula
26 May 201763.3AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
26 May 201763.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Motula
26 May 201763.3AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
29 Jun 201763.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ostia, Italy
28 Jun 201864.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201864.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
7 Oct 201864.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marco
11 Jul 201965.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian)
24 Oct 202066.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Angelo De Donatis
Angelo Cardinal De Donatis (born ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasarano, Diocese of Narḍ
Ordained PriestSan Domenico, Church, Casarano, Diocese of Narḍ
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2015
  • ob: CB, 22 Sep 2015
  • c2: CB, 12 Oct 2015
  • c34: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,670
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 May 2017
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2019
  • ceas: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast