Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal d’Aragona

Deceased

Administrator of Nardò, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1474Born
May 1494³19.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
19 Feb 149621.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
19 Feb 149621.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 149824.2AppointedAdministrator of Lecce, Italy
1501²26.3AppointedAdministrator of Policastro, Italy
10 Mar 150126.5AppointedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
24 Mar 150227.5ResignedAdministrator of Lecce, Italy
20 Jan 150328.3AppointedAdministrator of Capaccio, Italy
22 Apr 150429.6ResignedAdministrator of Policastro, Italy
Sep 1507³32.9AppointedAdministrator of Orense, Spain
7 Jun 1508³33.7ResignedAdministrator of Orense, Spain
26 Sep 150834.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
1511²36.3AppointedAdministrator of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
10 Feb 151136.4AppointedAdministrator of Cádiz, Spain
6 Jun 151136.7AppointedAdministrator of León, Spain
22 Mar 151439.5ResignedAdministrator of Capaccio, Italy
5 May 151439.6ResignedAdministrator of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
21 May 151540.7ResignedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
17 Dec 151642.2ResignedAdministrator of León, Spain
18 May 151742.6AppointedAdministrator of Alessano, Italy
25 May 151742.7ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
17 Jun 151742.7AppointedAdministrator of Nardò, Italy
17 May 151843.6ResignedAdministrator of Alessano, Italy
21 Jan 151944.3DiedAdministrator of Nardò, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi d’Aragona (VIAF: 69729990)
Luigi Cardinal d’Aragona (born , died ) Administrator of Nardò

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a cardinal for 24.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, May 1494
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 103, and Page 256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 277, and Page 124
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 249, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Apr 2021

Quantcast