Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heriberto Andrés Bodeant Fernández

Bishop of Canelones, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1955 Born
27 Sep 198631.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salto, Uruguay
28 Jun 200348.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salto, Uruguay
28 Jun 200348.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ampora
27 Sep 200348.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ampora
13 Jun 200953.9AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
19 Mar 202165.7AppointedBishop of Canelones, Uruguay
18 Apr 202165.8InstalledBishop of Canelones, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Heriberto Andrés Bodeant Fernández
Bishop Heriberto Andrés Bodeant Fernández (born ) Bishop of Canelones

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYoung
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Salto, Diocese of Salto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Canelones.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,466
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2021
  • i: AM, 25 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast