Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Barbetta Manzocchi

Auxiliary Bishop of Huarí, Peru

Titular Bishop of Isola

Apostolic Administrator of Huarí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1971 Born
20 Sep 199827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gubbio, Italy
12 Dec 201948.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huarí, Peru
12 Dec 201948.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Isola
11 Feb 202048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isola
14 Jun 202149.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Huarí, Peru

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Barbetta Manzocchi
Bishop Giorgio Barbetta Manzocchi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Huarí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerbenno di Valtellina, Diocese of Como, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Huarí, Diocese of Huarí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huarí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2020
  • c34: CB, 11 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,349
  • aadm: CB, 16 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jun 2021

Quantcast