Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivo Baldi Gaburri

Deceased

Bishop of Huarķ, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1947Born
9 Oct 197124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cittą di Castello, Italy
14 Dec 199952.7AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
6 Jan 200052.7Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
4 Feb 200456.8AppointedPrelate of Huarķ, Peru
29 May 200457.1InstalledPrelate of Huarķ, Peru
2 Apr 200861.0AppointedBishop of Huarķ, Peru
11 Jun 202174.2DiedBishop of Huarķ, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ivo Baldi Gaburri
Bishop Ivo Baldi Gaburri (born , died ) Bishop of Huarķ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittą di Castello, Diocese of Cittą di Castello, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceClinica San Pablo, Huaraz, Diocese of Huaraz

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,663
  • d: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jun 2021

Quantcast