Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alberto Ayala Ramírez

Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Rusibisir


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1973 Born
1 Nov 200228.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
18 Jun 202046.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
18 Jun 202046.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
12 Dec 202047.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusibisir

MicroData Summary for Juan Alberto Ayala Ramírez
Bishop Juan Alberto Ayala Ramírez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Pregonero, Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
Ordained BishopJesucristo Sumo y Eterno Sacerdote Chapel, Santo Tomás de Aquino, Seminary, Palmira, Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2020
  • c1: CB, 18 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 25 Nov 2020
  • c2: CB, 9 Dec 2020
  • c34: CB, 12 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast