Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Celestino Cardinal Aós Braco, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Motto: Amar y Servir


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1945 Born
14 Aug 196318.3EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Aug 196419.3Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Sep 196722.4Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Mar 196822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Jul 201469.3AppointedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
18 Oct 201469.5Ordained BishopBishop of Copiapó, Chile
23 Mar 201973.9ResignedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
23 Mar 201973.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santiago de Chile
27 Dec 201974.7AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
11 Jan 202074.7InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
28 Nov 202075.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202075.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
19 Jun 202176.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
25 Oct 202378.5RetiredArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary
Celestino Aós Braco
Celestino Cardinal Aós Braco O.F.M. Cap.
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArtaiz, Diocese of Pamplona, Spain
Ordained PriestPamplona, Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Cathedral, Copiapó, Diocese of Copiapó

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 Aug 2014
  • c2+: CB, 6 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,309
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2019
  • c1: AM, 8 Apr 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 11 Jan 2020
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cpri: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • i: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2021
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025