Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

Pontificium Consilium de Spirituali Migrantium atque Itinerantium Cura



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antonio Maria Vegliò, Cardinal, President
  • Joseph (Joy) Kalathiparambil, Secretary
  • Francesco Gioia, O.F.M. Cap., Secretary Emeritus
  • Agostino Marchetto, Secretary Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Pontifical Council
  • Elevated: 28 June 1988
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: brings the pastoral concern of the Church to bear on the special needs of those who have been forced to leave their native land or who do not have one. It also sees to it that these matters are considered with the attention they deserve. (Pastor Bonus, 149)
  • Section on the Vatican Website: http://www.vatican.va/roman_curia/pontifical_councils/migrants/
  • Official Web Site: http://www.pcmigrants.org/
  • Mailing Address: 00153 Roma, Piazza S. Calisto, 16; 00120 Citta del Vaticano
  • Telephone: 06.69.88.71.93; 06.69.88.72.42
  • Fax: 06.69.88.71.11

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
19 March 1970ErectedPontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People (erected)
Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
28 June 1988ElevatedPontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
Congregation for Bishops
Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
1 January 2017SuppressedPontifical Council “Cor Unum” (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People (suppressed)
Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016