Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hearst

Dioecesis Hearstensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincent Cadieux, O.M.I., Bishop
  • André Vallée, P.M.E., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 December 1938
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ottawa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 108,830 (42,035 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: H
  • Official Web Site: http://www.hearstdiocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, C.P. 1330, 76 Septième rue, Hearst, ON P0L 1N0, Canada
  • Telephone: (705)362-4903
  • Fax: 362-4421

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)
18 April 1919ErectedDiocese of Haileybury Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)
17 November 1920ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)
3 December 1938Territory LostDiocese of Haileybury
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie de James {James Bay} (erected)
Diocese of Hearst
3 December 1938ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord) Diocese of Hearst (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hearst
195015,80024,49064.5%291039405107227ap1951
196633,77551,36065.8%40949689511233ap1966
197031,91448,95365.2%371350638198931ap1971
197634,08049,51568.8%29938896137832ap1977
198034,34850,71867.7%268341,010126230ap1981
199032,28850,34164.1%29291,11333330ap1991
199930,38339,46877.0%231241,265111429ap2000
200029,24338,32876.3%241251,169311529ap2001
200128,61537,70075.9%221231,244411328ap2002
200229,64338,72876.5%241251,185411029ap2003
200330,49939,58477.0%24241,27041029ap2004
200429,56338,33677.1%25251,1824927ap2005
200627,90836,68176.1%22221,2682722ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 9 Sep 2012