Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Zmajević

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1670³Born
18 Apr 170130.3AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
24 Dec 170131.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
22 May 171342.4AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
12 Aug 171342.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
1714²43.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
12 Sep 174574.7DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Zmajević
Archbishop Vincent Zmajević (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerasto

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88, and Page 129
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 225
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,685
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018