Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Walterfinger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien

Titular Bishop of Germanicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornAbensberg
9 Sep 163040.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien, Austria
9 Sep 163040.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
13 Mar 163242.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
27 Nov 164151.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Walterfinger:
Bishop Johann Walterfinger O.S.B. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 193
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015