Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Desmond A. Williams

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

Titular Bishop of Summa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1930BornDublin
4 Jun 195525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
14 Mar 198554.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
14 Mar 198554.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
21 Apr 198555.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa
18 Dec 199363.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
24 Feb 200675.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Desmond A. Williams:
Bishop Desmond A. Williams (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013