Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Wakering

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1415SelectedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
27 May 1416ConfirmedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
31 May 1416Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 1425DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Wakering
Bishop John Wakering (died ) Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 466
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,662

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast