Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philip Cardinal Repington, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln, England

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1404AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
29 Mar 1405Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 1408Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 1408AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
21 Nov 1419ResignedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
1424²DiedBishop Emeritus of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Repington:
Cardinal Philip Repington C.R.S.A. Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 306
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1408
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013