Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Fordham

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1381AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
5 Jan 1382Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 1388AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
19 Nov 1425DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Fordham
Bishop John Fordham (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 337
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018