Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Sudbury

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1361AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 1362Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
4 May 1375AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 1381DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Simon Sudbury
Archbishop Simon Sudbury (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311, and Page 163
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 292
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018