Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Wykeham (Wickham)

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1367AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
10 Oct 1367Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
27 Sep 1404DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Wykeham (Wickham):
Bishop William Wykeham (Wickham) (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 530
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013