Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Skirlawe

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1385AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
14 Jan 1386Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
25 Aug 1386AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 1388AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
24 Mar 1406DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Skirlawe:
Bishop Walter Skirlawe (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 291
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 231, and Page 130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013