Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Rushook, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1383AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
3 May 1383Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
16 Oct 1385AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
5 Mar 1388RemovedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
1389²AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
1393²DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Rushook
Bishop Thomas Rushook O.P. (died 1393) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Death PlaceEngland

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 187, and Page 292
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 243
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 247
  • b: CB, 27 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 May 2019

Quantcast