Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Courtenay

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1369AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
17 Mar 1370Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 1375AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
9 Sep 1381AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
31 Jul 1396DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Courtenay:
Archbishop William Courtenay (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 26.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 163, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013