Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Metford

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1389AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
8 May 1390³Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
3 Nov 1395AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
May 1407³DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Metford:
Bishop Richard Metford Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 17.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 187, and Page 435
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 601
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013