Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John de Waltham

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1388AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
20 Sep 1388Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
17 Sep 1395DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John de Waltham
Bishop John de Waltham (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBarnwell

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 601
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,827

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast