Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Braybroke

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1381AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
5 Jan 1382Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
28 Aug 1404DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert de Braybroke
Bishop Robert de Braybroke (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016