Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John de Bottlesham

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Apr 1400AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
4 Jul 1400Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
17 Apr 1404DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John de Bottlesham:
Bishop John de Bottlesham (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 422
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 565
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 83
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 6,646

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015