Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry de Spencer

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Apr 1370AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
21 Apr 1370Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1406DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry de Spencer
Bishop Henry de Spencer (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 36.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 465
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,446
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018