Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Bowet

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Aug 1401AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
20 Nov 1401Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
7 Nov 1407AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
20 Oct 1423DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Bowet
Archbishop Henry Bowet (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 233, and Page 130
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 139
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,651

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast