Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Swafham, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bangor, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1363AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
2 Jul 1376AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
24 Jun 1398DiedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Swafham:
Bishop John Swafham O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Bangor

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 127, and Page 193
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 100
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013