Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Chicheley

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1362²BornHigham Ferres, England
26 May 139634.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 139634.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 140745.7AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
17 Jun 140846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
27 Apr 141452.3AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 144381.2DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Chicheley
Archbishop Henry Chicheley (born 1362, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 163, and Page 336
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 117
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 22, and Page 296
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84
  • b/od/op: CB, 11 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Feb 2016