Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Lacy

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateEventTitle
Feb 1417³SelectedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
3 Mar 1417ConfirmedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
18 Apr 1417Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
5 May 1420SelectedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 1420ConfirmedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 1455DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Lacy:
Bishop Edmund Lacy (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 374, and Page 464
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 243, and Page 274
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013