Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chandler

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹Born
15 Nov 141767.8SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
7 Dec 141767.9ConfirmedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
12 Dec 141767.9Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
16 Jul 142676.5DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Chandler (VIAF: 6366035)
Bishop John Chandler (born 1350, died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 602
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017