Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Patryngton (Patrington), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1415AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
19 Jun 1415Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
22 Nov 1417DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
15 Dec 1417AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Stephen Patryngton (Patrington)
Bishop Stephen Patryngton (Patrington) O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAll Saints, Maidstone

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 244, and Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 187, and Page 336
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast