Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Catterick (Catrik)

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1414AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
1 Feb 1415AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
20 Nov 1419AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 1419DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Catterick (Catrik):
Bishop John Catterick (Catrik) (died ) Bishop of Exeter

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,451
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 296, and Page 373
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 552
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 336, and Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 208
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013