Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Vitolo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1733BornNapoli
18 Sep 176229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 Jan 179864.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
18 Mar 179864.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
1810¹76.3DiedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Vitolo
Bishop Gaetano Vitolo (born , died 1810) Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016