Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Matteo Vitelloni

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1661BornBagancavollo
12 Mar 170139.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 170745.3AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
24 Apr 170745.3Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
Jul 1710³48.5DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Matteo Vitelloni:
Bishop Giovanni Matteo Vitelloni (born ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 9.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 150
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015