Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Villani

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1745BornPresicce
27 Feb 176822.9Ordained PriestPriest
Jun 1805³60.2SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
26 Jun 180560.3ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
30 Jun 180560.3Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
10 Mar 182378.0DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Villani:
Bishop Lorenzo Villani (born , died ) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013