Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Fernández Velarde

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1690BornSierra Elsa
5 Jul 175161.2AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
12 Sep 175161.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
11 Oct 175767.5DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fernández Velarde:
Bishop Pedro Fernández Velarde (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013