Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Carlo Gaetano Varano

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1667³BornFerrara
22 Jun 169224.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 169830.5AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
17 Aug 169830.6Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
20 Oct 173567.8DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Carlo Gaetano Varano:
Bishop Alessandro Carlo Gaetano Varano (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 251
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015