Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gregorio Urbieta

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1787Born
7 Jul 181124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
15 Dec 185669.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
15 Dec 185669.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
10 May 185769.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
23 Mar 186072.8AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
17 Jan 186577.6DiedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

MicroData Summary for Juan Gregorio Urbieta
Bishop Juan Gregorio Urbieta (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilleta, Diocese of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
Ordained BishopAssomption, Diocese of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127, and Page 228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast