Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio Palacios

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1824Born
16 Oct 184723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Sep 184824.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186338.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Paraguay
16 Mar 186338.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
30 Aug 186339.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
17 Jan 186540.6SucceededBishop of Paraguay
21 Dec 186844.5DiedBishop of Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Palacios (VIAF: 4700340)
Bishop Manuel Antonio Palacios (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuque
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paraguay, Diocese of Paraguay

  • a priest for 20.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,537
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017