Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio López

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1779¹Born
19 Apr 180324.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Apr 180324.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 184465.5AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
31 Aug 184566.6Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
16 Jan 185980.0DiedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilio López
Bishop Basilio López (born 1779, died ) Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecoleta

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast